CT SB00572 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-01 - Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-01 - Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To establish the Office of Broadband Advocacy within the Office of Consumer Counsel to facilitate the availability of broadband access to every state citizen.
Title
An Act Establishing The Office Of Broadband Advocacy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-01 | Senate | Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-05-13 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-04-21 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2015-04-08 | Senate | File Number 548 |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 311 |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/10 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |