CT SB00570 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To authorize a tribal resort-casino in Bridgeport, sports wagering, online casino gaming and online lottery.
Title
An Act Authorizing A Tribal Resort-casino In Bridgeport, Sports Wagering, Online Casino Gaming And Online Lottery.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-24 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 18 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-12 | Senate | File Number 396 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 250 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/21 10:00 AM |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/02 |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |