CT SB00543 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-08 - Public Hearing 02/14
Pending: Joint Select Committee on Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-08 - Public Hearing 02/14
Pending: Joint Select Committee on Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require health insurance coverage for equine therapy for veterans.
Title
An Act Requiring Health Insurance Coverage For Equine Therapy For Veterans.
Sponsors
Sen. John Kissel [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-05 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/14 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Veterans' Affairs |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Change of Reference, House to Committee on Veterans' Affairs |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Change of Reference Veterans' Affairs |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |