CT SB00527 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To establish the Transportation Center Improvement District within the city of Stamford.
Title
An Act Establishing The Transportation Center Improvement District Within The City Of Stamford.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 263 AS AMENDED (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 246 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 5479 (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 247 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 246 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 5479 (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 247 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-06 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2018-05-23 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2018-05-23 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2018-05-21 | House | Special Act 18-9 |
2018-05-08 | House | In Concurrence |
2018-05-08 | House | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-08 | House | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-08 | House | Rules Suspended |
2018-05-08 | House | House Calendar Number 580 |
2018-05-08 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-05-07 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5479 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | File Number 629 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 390 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/18 10:00 AM |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Public Hearing 04/02 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |