CT SB00524 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-19 - File Number 619
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-19 - File Number 619
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To provide that a qualified person withdrawing blood in the case of a person driving while intoxicated shall not incur any civil liability, to clarify responsibility for penalties imposed for violations of permits issued for nonconforming motor vehicles in response to the ruling of the court in State v. Ginnetti Petroleum Transporters, LLC, A05D-MI16-2758602-S (G.A. 5 at Derby), to make a conforming change to the assault statutes and to provide for criminal lockout protection to tenants of nonresidential properties.
Title
An Act Concerning Revisions To Various Statutes Concerning The Criminal Justice System.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-04 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-19 | Senate | File Number 619 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 371 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/18 5:00 PM |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/26 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |