CT SB00522 | 2017 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To authorize bear hunting in Connecticut.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Authorizing Bear Hunting In Connecticut.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 157 ADOPT SENATE AMD C LCO 7304 (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 158 ADOPT SENATE AMD D LCO 7305 (Y: 18 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-10 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-18SenateReferred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
2017-05-18SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule D 7305
2017-05-18SenateSenate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule C 7304
2017-05-18SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 7396
2017-05-17SenateMatter Pass Retained
2017-05-17SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6744
2017-03-27SenateFile Number 241
2017-03-27SenateSenate Calendar Number 142
2017-03-27SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2017-03-27SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2017-03-20SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/17 10:00 AM
2017-03-13SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2017-03-10SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2017-03-02SenatePublic Hearing 03/06
2017-03-01SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Environment
2017-02-28SenateDrafted by Committee
2017-01-27SenateVote to Draft
2017-01-20SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Environment

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback