CT SB00516 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-19 - File Number 616
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-19 - File Number 616
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To make various technical changes concerning grammar, clarity and accuracy of internal references and consistency in the general statutes.
Title
An Act Concerning The Revisor's Technical Corrections To The General Statutes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-04 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-19 | Senate | File Number 616 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 369 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/18 5:00 PM |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/26 |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |