CT SB00493 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Transmitted to the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Transmitted to the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Extending The Provisions Of Certain Executive Orders.
Title
An Act Extending The Provisions Of Certain Executive Orders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-13 - House - House Roll Call Vote 39 EMERGENCY CERTIFICATION (Y: 90 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 74 (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 74 (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Special Act 22-3 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Signed by Governor in Original |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Governor |
2022-04-13 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2022-04-13 | Senate | House Passed |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Emergency Certification |