CT SB00491 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-30 - House Calendar Number 542
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-30 - House Calendar Number 542
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To convey a parcel of state property in the town of Sharon.
Title
An Act Concerning The Conveyance Of A Parcel Of State Land In The Town Of Sharon.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 268 (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-30 | Senate | House Calendar Number 542 |
2022-04-30 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2022-04-26 | Senate | File Number 660 |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 473 |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/25/22 5:00 PM |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 04/12 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |