CT SB00489 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-01 - House Calendar Number 492
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-01 - House Calendar Number 492
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To establish a criminal offense of unlawful dissemination of an intimate image with respect to persons who knowingly disseminate an intimate image of another person with the intent to harass, annoy, alarm or terrorize such other person.
Title
An Act Concerning The Unlawful Dissemination Of An Intimate Image Of Another Person.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 237 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-01 | Senate | House Calendar Number 492 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-30 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4356 |
2014-04-17 | Senate | File Number 616 |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 408 |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/14 5:00 PM |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/24 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |