CT SB00488 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To amend a prior authorization for a conveyance of a parcel of state land to the town of Hamden to extend the deadline for the conveyance to occur.
Title
An Act Amending A Conveyance Of State Land To The Town Of Hamden.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 261 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 270 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 270 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Special Act 22-17 |
2022-05-04 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2022-05-04 | Senate | House Passed |
2022-04-30 | Senate | House Calendar Number 539 |
2022-04-30 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-29 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2022-04-26 | Senate | File Number 657 |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 470 |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/25/22 5:00 PM |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 04/12 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |