CT SB00486 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - File Number 577
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - File Number 577
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require notification to local and regional boards of education when a released juvenile sexual offender will reside in a town served by the board, and to require a model policy concerning reentry of such juveniles into the school system.
Title
An Act Concerning Notification To Boards Of Education Of The Release Of A Juvenile Sexual Offender And A Model Policy Concerning The Reentry Of Such Juveniles Into The School System.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-04 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 25 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Senate | File Number 577 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 351 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/18 5:00 PM |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/28 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |