CT SB00485 | 2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

To establish the time frame applicable to a judgment lienholder's response to a request for a payoff statement from a judgment debtor or an agent acting on behalf of such judgment debtor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Provision Of A Payoff Statement By A Judgment Lienholder.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 302 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 193 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-04SenateSigned by the Governor
2018-05-22SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2018-05-22SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2018-05-18SenatePublic Act 18-70
2018-05-09SenateIn Concurrence
2018-05-09SenateOn Consent Calendar
2018-05-09SenateHouse Passed
2018-05-05SenateHouse Calendar Number 523
2018-05-05SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2018-05-03SenateOn Consent Calendar
2018-05-03SenateSenate Passed
2018-04-19SenateFile Number 614
2018-04-19SenateSenate Calendar Number 367
2018-04-19SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2018-04-19SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-04-13SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/18 5:00 PM
2018-04-04SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-04-04SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2018-03-15SenatePublic Hearing 03/19
2018-03-12SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback