CT SB00485 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-19 - Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-19 - Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To allow an alcoholic liquor wholesaler who intends to offer a depletion allowance for wine or spirits to provide written notice to the Department of Consumer Protection.
Title
An Act Concerning Notice To The Department Of Consumer Protection Regarding Depletion Allowances For Wine Or Spirits, Registration Requirements For Craft Beer And Farmers' Market Wine Sales Permits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-06 - House - House Roll Call Vote 362 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 149 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 140 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 140 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-19 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Public Act 17-90 |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor in Original |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Governor |
2017-06-06 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2017-06-06 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2017-06-06 | Senate | House Passed |
2017-05-19 | Senate | House Calendar Number 521 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-05-17 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-05-09 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2017-03-22 | Senate | File Number 143 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 111 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/07 |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |