CT SB00485 | 2014 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - House Calendar Number 477
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To allow municipalities to designate priority development sites that will be eligible for expedited permitting through the Department of Economic and Community Development's Office of the Permit Ombudsman.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Expedited Permitting For Priority Development Sites Identified By Municipalities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 180 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-25SenateHouse Calendar Number 477
2014-04-25SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2014-04-24SenateOn Consent Calendar
2014-04-24SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2014-04-24SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4096
2014-04-16SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2014-04-16SenateNo New File by Committee on Planning and Development
2014-04-16SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2014-04-16SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2014-04-15SenateJoint Favorable
2014-04-09SenateReferred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development
2014-04-03SenateFile Number 331
2014-04-03SenateSenate Calendar Number 224
2014-04-03SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2014-04-03SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2014-03-28SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/14 5:00 PM
2014-03-20SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2014-03-20SenateJoint Favorable
2014-03-14SenatePublic Hearing 03/18
2014-03-13SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Commerce

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback