CT SB00485 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-12 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-12 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To allow certain municipal employees to serve as citation hearing officers.
Title
An Act Permitting Municipal Employees To Serve As Citation Hearing Officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-12 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-05-12 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-05-12 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-12 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-12 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-05-11 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-05-04 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-05-04 | No New File by Committee on Transportation | |
2011-05-03 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-03 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-03 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-04-27 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Transportation | |
2011-04-07 | File Number 443 | |
2011-04-07 | Senate Calendar Number 282 | |
2011-04-07 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-04-07 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-01 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-03-25 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-23 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development | |
2011-03-09 | Drafted by Committee | |
2011-03-07 | Vote to Draft | |
2011-02-25 | Public Hearing 03/02 | |
2011-01-31 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing | |
2011-01-21 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |