CT SB00484 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-25 - File Number 623
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-25 - File Number 623
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require emissions and decibel level testing for motor vehicles and motorcycles and establish a higher rate of sales and use taxes for motorcycles and certain motorcycle mufflers that exceed the maximum allowable decibel level.
Title
An Act Concerning Emissions And Decibel Level Testing For Motor Vehicles And The Taxation Of Certain Motorcycles And Motorcycle Mufflers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 35 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Senate | File Number 623 |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 451 |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/25/22 12:00 PM |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/30 |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |