CT SB00484 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 17 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-22 - File Number 617
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-22 - File Number 617
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To effectuate a securitization of existing charges on electric bills through the issuance of rate replacement bonds, of proceeds from instituting the game of keno, or of tobacco settlement funds, and to impose a hospital user fee.
Title
An Act Concerning Securitization.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-22 | File Number 617 | |
2010-04-22 | Senate Calendar Number 458 | |
2010-04-22 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-22 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-16 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/21/10 5:00 PM | |
2010-04-06 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-06 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2010-03-18 | Public Hearing 03/22 | |
2010-03-17 | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |