CT SB00479 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-25 - File Number 620
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-25 - File Number 620
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a training program to assist individuals seeking to obtain a commercial driver's license for the purpose of establishing a career as a commercial truck driver.
Title
An Act Establishing A Commercial Driver's License Training Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 40 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Senate | File Number 620 |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 448 |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/25/22 12:00 PM |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/31 |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |