CT SB00479 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To extend the immunity provided to those who in good faith report suspected child abuse or neglect to medical professionals involved in the evaluation of the suspected abuse or neglect.
Title
An Act Concerning Immunity From Civil Or Criminal Liability For Persons Providing Medical Assistance Or Intervention In A Child Abuse Or Neglect Case.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 266 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 192 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 192 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Public Act 18-57 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2018-05-08 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2018-05-08 | Senate | House Passed |
2018-05-05 | Senate | House Calendar Number 522 |
2018-05-05 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-05-03 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2018-04-19 | Senate | File Number 611 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 364 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/18 5:00 PM |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/16 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |