CT SB00475 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To authorize the towns of New London, East Lyme and Waterford to create a regional dispatch authority.
Title
An Act Concerning Mutual Consolidation Of Dispatch Facilities In New London, East Lyme And Waterford.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 324 AS AMENDED (Y: 131 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 301 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 301 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2015-06-26 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2015-06-26 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Special Act 15-22 |
2015-06-02 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2015-06-02 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2015-06-02 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2015-05-29 | Senate | House Calendar Number 648 |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-05-27 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8368 |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-05-22 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-04-01 | Senate | File Number 349 |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 255 |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/17 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |