CT SB00473 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-05 - File Number 301
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-05 - File Number 301
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To make a minor change to a statute related to the Department of Banking.
Title
An Act Concerning The Department Of Banking.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-20 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-05 | Senate | File Number 301 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 173 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/15 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Banking |