CT SB00469 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-14 - File Number 490
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-14 - File Number 490
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To define competitive procurement and permit its use for the purchase or acquisition of services by a state agency.
Title
An Act Concerning The Use Of Competitive Procurement For State Contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-14 | Senate | File Number 490 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 336 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/25 |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |