CT SB00466 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To convey a parcel of state land in the town of Rocky Hill.
Title
An Act Concerning The Conveyance Of A Parcel Of State Land In The Town Of Rocky Hill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 260 (Y: 141 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 272 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 272 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Special Act 22-16 |
2022-05-04 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2022-05-04 | Senate | House Passed |
2022-04-30 | Senate | House Calendar Number 538 |
2022-04-30 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-29 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2022-04-26 | Senate | File Number 656 |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 469 |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/25/22 5:00 PM |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 04/12 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |