CT SB00466 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To reduce the number of dual arrests that occur in domestic violence cases and enhance domestic violence training offered to state and local law enforcement agencies.
Title
An Act Concerning Dual Arrests And The Training Required Of Law Enforcement Personnel With Respect To Domestic Violence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 196 AS AMENDED (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 131 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 143 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 131 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 143 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-14 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Public Act 18-5 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2018-05-03 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-03 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-05-03 | Senate | House Calendar Number 494 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4548 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | File Number 549 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 334 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/18 5:00 PM |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/16 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |