CT SB00466 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-21 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-21 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To allow physicians to take continuing education courses on specified topics once every six years and to require physicians to take continuing education courses on the topic of behavioral health.
Title
An Act Concerning Continuing Education Courses For Physicians.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 382 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 171 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 171 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-21 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Public Act 13-217 |
2013-06-04 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2013-06-04 | Senate | House Passed |
2013-04-25 | Senate | House Calendar Number 439 |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-24 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2013-04-16 | Senate | File Number 517 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 382 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/13 5:00 PM |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/20 |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |