CT SB00456 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To allow a school district to enter into a memorandum of understanding with other school districts for the purpose of educating and supporting displaced students from Puerto Rico.
Title
An Act Concerning Assistance To School Districts That Enroll Students From Puerto Rico Who Have Been Displaced By Hurricane Maria.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 302 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 214 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 214 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-04 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Special Act 18-7 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2018-05-09 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2018-05-09 | Senate | House Passed |
2018-05-06 | Senate | House Calendar Number 550 |
2018-05-06 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-05-04 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2018-04-09 | Senate | File Number 346 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 213 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/18 10:00 AM |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/14 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |