CT SB00454 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-27 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-27 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To ensure that criminal records subject to erasure are automatically erased and to provide notifications of such erasure.
Title
An Act Concerning Automatic Erasure Of Criminal Records And Bail For Persons Charged With Misdemeanor Drug Possession.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-27 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-27 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4346 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | File Number 635 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 408 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/18 |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |