CT SB00454 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - House Calendar Number 553
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - House Calendar Number 553
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require that municipalities be reimbursed for fifty per cent of the costs of police certification when a police officer is hired by another municipality within two years of such certification.
Title
An Act Concerning Payment Of The Costs Of Certification For A Police Officer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-14 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 196 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-15 | Senate | House Calendar Number 553 |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-05-14 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-04-24 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Public Safety and Security |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Public Safety and Security |
2015-04-08 | Senate | File Number 547 |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 325 |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/13 |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |