CT SB00453 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-13 - File Number 453
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-13 - File Number 453
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To allow residential care homes to qualify as home and community-based settings under the regulations of the Center for Medicare and Medicaid Services.
Title
An Act Concerning The Department Of Public Health's Recommendations Regarding Transfers And Discharges Of Residential Care Home Residents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-25 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | Senate | File Number 453 |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 317 |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/21 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |