CT SB00453 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on June 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Senate Reconsidered, Veto Sustained
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Senate Reconsidered, Veto Sustained
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To include provisions relating to daily classroom safety in safe school climate plans, establish a student to school social worker ratio, and to require notification of incidents of violations of daily classroom safety.
Title
An Act Concerning Classroom Safety And Disruptive Behavior.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 396 REPASS (Y: 14 N: 17 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 258 AS AMENDED (Y: 119 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 216 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 258 AS AMENDED (Y: 119 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 216 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | Senate | Senate Reconsidered, Veto Sustained |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Senate Reconsidered |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Public Act 18-89 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2018-05-08 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-08 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-06 | Senate | House Calendar Number 549 |
2018-05-06 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-05-04 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4546 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | File Number 480 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 281 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/14 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |