CT SB00453 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-24 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-24 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To adopt the recommendations of the Connecticut Sentencing Commission regarding relief from barriers to employment, licensure and public housing for persons whose eligibility is limited due to prior conviction of a crime.
Title
An Act Concerning Certificates Of Relief From Barriers Resulting From Conviction Of A Crime.
Sponsors
Rep. Juan Candelaria [D] | Rep. Charles Clemons [D] | House Judiciary Committee | Sen. Douglas McCrory [D] |
Sen. Patricia Miller [D] | Rep. Robert Sanchez [D] | Sen. Gary Winfield [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-24 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-04-19 | File Number 533 | |
2012-04-19 | Senate Calendar Number 382 | |
2012-04-19 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-04-19 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-13 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/12 5:00 PM | |
2012-04-02 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-02 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2012-03-19 | Public Hearing 03/23 | |
2012-03-16 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |