CT SB00452 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To include Holocaust and genocide education awareness in the social studies curriculum for public schools.
Title
An Act Concerning The Inclusion Of Holocaust And Genocide Education And Awareness In The Social Studies Curriculum.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 243 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 84 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 86 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 84 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 86 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Public Act 18-24 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor in Original |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Governor |
2018-05-07 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2018-05-07 | Senate | House Passed |
2018-04-25 | Senate | House Calendar Number 453 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2018-04-09 | Senate | File Number 340 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 212 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/18 10:00 AM |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/14 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |