CT SB00451 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-25 - Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-25 - Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To protect patients from unreasonable medical bills.
Title
An Act Protecting Patients From Unreasonable Medical Bills.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-24 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2017-04-13 | Senate | File Number 610 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 331 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/17 |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |