CT SB00446 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To require the Labor Commissioner to establish a definition of the term "domestic worker" for use in the general statutes so that domestic workers working in the state may be afforded protections that are not available to them under current law.
Title
An Act Concerning Domestic Service And The Commission On Human Rights And Opportunities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 339 AS AMENDED (Y: 126 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-05-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 334 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A, B (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 332 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 8374 (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 334 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A, B (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 332 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 8374 (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-30 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2015-06-26 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2015-06-26 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Public Act 15-249 |
2015-06-02 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2015-06-02 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B |
2015-06-02 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B |
2015-06-02 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2015-05-30 | Senate | House Calendar Number 670 |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 8651 |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8374 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | File Number 254 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 202 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/17 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |