CT SB00445 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To increase public and government knowledge of pharmaceutical prices.
Title
An Act Concerning Contracts Between A Pharmacy And A Pharmacy Benefits Manager, The Bidirectional Exchange Of Electronic Health Records And The Charging Of Facility Fees By A Hospital Or Health System.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 368 AS AMENDED (Y: 127 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 374 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 173 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 374 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 173 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Public Act 17-241 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Disagreeing Action, Tabled for Calendar, Senate |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2017-06-07 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2017-06-07 | Senate | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8614 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2017-05-26 | Senate | House Calendar Number 591 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-05-24 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7774 |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-05-10 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-04-11 | Senate | File Number 519 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 295 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |