CT SB00440 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To make various technical changes concerning grammar, clarity and accuracy of internal references and consistency in the general statutes.
Title
An Act Concerning The Revisor's Technical Corrections To The General Statutes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 175 (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 136 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 136 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Public Act 22-37 |
2022-05-02 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2022-05-02 | Senate | House Passed |
2022-04-21 | Senate | House Calendar Number 433 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-19 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2022-04-13 | Senate | File Number 450 |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 315 |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/21 |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |