CT SB00440 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - File Number 855
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To prohibit an employer from coercing employees into attending or participating in meetings sponsored by the employer concerning the employer's views on political or religious matters.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Protecting Employee Freedom Of Speech And Conscience.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30SenateFile Number 855
2019-04-30SenateSenate Calendar Number 451
2019-04-30SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-30SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-23SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/29/19 5:00 PM
2019-04-12SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-10SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-14SenatePublic Hearing 03/18
2019-03-12SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
2019-03-11SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-02-01SenateVote to Draft
2019-01-23SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback