CT SB00439 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-17 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Public Safety and Security
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-17 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Public Safety and Security
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the recommendations of the Emergency Medical Services Advisory Board.
Title
An Act Concerning Recommendations Of The Emergency Medical Services Advisory Board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Public Safety and Security |
2014-04-10 | Senate | File Number 485 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 314 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/19 |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |