CT SB00434 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-03 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-03 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To improve the provision of health care to children by enabling school nurses and primary care providers to obtain access to data concerning a child's possible exposure to lead.
Title
An Act Concerning Access To The Department Of Public Health's Lead Surveillance System.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 17 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-04-13 | Senate | File Number 606 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 327 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |