CT SB00430 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-12 - File Number 433
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-12 - File Number 433
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To appropriate two hundred fifty thousand dollars for the operations of the state-wide firearms trafficking task force for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2023.
Title
An Act Funding The State-wide Firearms Trafficking Task Force.
Sponsors
House Government Administration and Elections Committee | Rep. Craig Fishbein [R] | Sen. Dan Champagne [R] | Sen. Robert Sampson [R] |
Rep. Gale Mastrofrancesco [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-12 | Senate | File Number 433 |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 297 |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/25 |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |