CT SB00429 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To enable the transfer of funds from the Passport to the Parks account and require special event fees at state parks to be based on the number of attendees and cover state costs related to such events.
Title
An Act Concerning The Passport To The Parks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 218 AS AMENDED (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 92 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 94 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 92 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 94 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-24 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Public Act 18-7 |
2018-05-04 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2018-05-04 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-04 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2018-04-26 | Senate | House Calendar Number 465 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3695 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | File Number 298 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 170 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/16 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |