CT SB00426 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To make various changes to statutes relating to: (1) The duties of the Chief Court Administrator, (2) certain court processes and procedures, (3) duties undertaken by attorneys, and (4) entities operating under the auspices of the Judicial Branch.
Title
An Act Concerning Court Operations And Administrative Proceedings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 223 AS AMENDED (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 208 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet-A (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 208 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet-A (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-04 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2024-05-28 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2024-05-28 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Public Act 24-108 |
2024-05-08 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2024-05-08 | House | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2024-05-08 | House | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2024-05-07 | House | House Calendar Number 493 |
2024-05-07 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-05-06 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5822 |
2024-04-17 | Senate | File Number 532 |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 303 |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/24 5:00 PM |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/18 |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |