CT SB00425 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-05 - File Number 297
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-05 - File Number 297
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To establish a preference for the purchase of yellow-tinted LED lights whenever state funds are used for the purchase of LED lights in order to minimize the health effects and glare from white LED lighting and to authorize municipalities to develop their own ordinances concerning light pollution.
Title
An Act Concerning Led Light Pollution In The State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-05 | Senate | File Number 297 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 169 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/14 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |