CT SB00424 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To provide access to preschool for all children who are in the custody of the Department of Children and Families.
Title
An Act Concerning Access To Preschool Programs For Children In The Care And Custody Of The Department Of Children And Families.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 299 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 219 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 219 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-13 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Special Act 14-22 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2014-05-07 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2014-05-07 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-07 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-01 | Senate | House Calendar Number 482 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-29 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4572 |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-23 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Human Services |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Human Services |
2014-04-07 | Senate | File Number 391 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 254 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/14 10:00 AM |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/12 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |