CT SB00423 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-1-1)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-05 - File Number 320
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-05 - File Number 320
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require local and regional boards of education to maintain healthy indoor air quality in their schools.
Title
An Act Improving Indoor Air Quality In Public School Classrooms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-22 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | Senate | File Number 320 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 239 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/15 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |