CT SB00418 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To: (1) Allow the Labor Commissioner to issue fines and citations to contractors and subcontractors who violate the state's prevailing wage laws; and (2) permit the Attorney General to commence a civil action against a contractor or subcontractor who repeatedly violates the state's prevailing wage laws.
Title
An Act Concerning Wage Theft.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-28 - House - House Roll Call Vote 129 AS AMENDED (Y: 128 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 152 (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 152 (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Public Act 22-17 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2022-04-28 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2022-04-28 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2022-04-22 | Senate | House Calendar Number 452 |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5008 |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-12 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-03-31 | Senate | File Number 253 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 204 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/15 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |