CT SB00418 | 2021 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-16 - File Number 60
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To increase the amount of personal income a long-term care facility resident who receives medical assistance may keep and authorize a deduction for conservator expenses from the amount of income a Medicaid recipient must apply toward the cost of his or her care.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Increasing The Personal Needs Allowance For Certain Long-term Care Facility Residents And Authorizing A Deduction For Conservator Expenses From The Amount Of Income A Medicaid Recipient Applies To The Cost Of Care.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-02 - Joint - AGE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Joint - AGE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-16SenateFile Number 60
2021-03-16SenateSenate Calendar Number 72
2021-03-16SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2021-03-16SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2021-03-10SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/15/21 5:00 PM
2021-03-03SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2021-03-02SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2021-02-18SenatePublic Hearing 02/23
2021-02-17SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Aging
2021-02-16SenateDrafted by Committee
2021-02-09SenateVote to Draft
2021-01-27SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Aging

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback