CT SB00417 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the Department of Revenue Services' recommendations regarding state taxation and collection.
Title
An Act Concerning The Department Of Revenue Services' Recommendations Regarding State Taxation And Collection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 302 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 274 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 45 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 274 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 45 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-14 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2018-05-31 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2018-05-31 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2018-05-25 | House | Public Act 18-152 |
2018-05-09 | House | In Concurrence |
2018-05-09 | House | On Consent Calendar |
2018-05-09 | House | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-09 | House | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-08 | House | House Calendar Number 585 |
2018-05-08 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-05-08 | House | On Consent Calendar |
2018-05-08 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5810 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | File Number 627 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 388 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/18 10:00 AM |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/16 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |