CT SB00417 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To allow certain health care facilities to provide psychiatric and substance use disorder treatment services at locations that are not physically part of the licensed clinic or facility.
Title
An Act Concerning The Provision Of Behavioral Health And Substance Use Treatment Services By Multi-care Institutions.
Sponsors
House Public Health Committee | Rep. Philip Miller [D] | Rep. David Scribner [R] | Rep. Vincent Candelora [R] |
Sen. Theresa Gerratana [D] | Sen. Anthony Musto [D] | Rep. Theresa Conroy [D] | Rep. Patricia Dillon [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 291 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 334 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 334 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-13 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Public Act 14-211 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2014-05-07 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2014-05-07 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-07 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2014-05-07 | Senate | House Calendar Number 537 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2014-05-06 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5254 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | File Number 458 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 300 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/19 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |